skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/10/21 20:55:33 PM

Alharbi, Faiz Mosa F

CPSO#: 85542

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 May 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 May 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Al Hrbi, Faiz Mosa F (used until: 27 Feb 2011 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Dept of Emergency Medicine
1995 Lense ave
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

89 Norman St
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Canada
Phone: (519) 464-4400
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:16 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FAIZ MOSA F ALHARBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALHARBI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 2006 to 23 Oct 2006
PEAP - R - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2006 to 23 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2007 to 23 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2008 to 23 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2009 to 23 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2010 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2013