THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 19:17:31 PM
Alharbi, Faiz Mosa F
CPSO#:
85542
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 May 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 May 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Al Hrbi, Faiz Mosa F (used until: 27 Feb 2011 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Dept of Emergency Medicine
1995 Lense ave
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Erie Shores HealthCare |
Leamington |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:16 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FAIZ MOSA F ALHARBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALHARBI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 2006 to 23 Oct 2006
PEAP - R - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2006 to 23 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2007 to 23 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2008 to 23 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2009 to 23 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2010 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Oct 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 May 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 May 2013 |