skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/05/22 3:19:30 AM

Etoom, Yousef Ahmad Tawfiq

CPSO#: 85032

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Jul 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education: Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4001 Leslie St
Paediatric Department
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
pediatric department
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: 9058134120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Etoom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Etoom ( CPSO# 85032 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:13 Jul 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Pediatric Cardiology Effective:22 Dec 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Pediatric Emergency Medicine Effective:22 Dec 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2021 Active
 1. Dr. Yousef Ahmad Tawfiq Etoom may practise medicine independently in pediatric emergency medicine and pediatric cardiology.

Concerns

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: May 11, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: October 23, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)