THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:10:21 AM
Etoom, Yousef Ahmad Tawfiq
CPSO#:
85032
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
13 Jul 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:13 Jul 2021 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Pediatric Cardiology |
Effective:22 Dec 2021 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Pediatric Emergency Medicine |
Effective:22 Dec 2021 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2021 |
|
Active |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: May 11, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: October 23, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)