skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/09/22 19:14:46 PM

Raymond, Louise

CPSO#: 67043

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Jan 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Division Cardiac Surgery
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3153 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Duggal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Duggal ( CPSO# 65435 )
Dr. L. Raymond ( CPSO# 67043 )

Business Address:
Clinical Neurological Sciences
London Health Sciences Centre - University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-2926

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:02 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Pathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Apr 1999
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2000
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jan 2019 Active
             Dr. Louise Raymond may practise medicine as a surgical assistant, only.