THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 6:02:20 AM
Raymond, Louise
CPSO#:
67043
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
21 Jan 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Division Cardiac Surgery
339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3153
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Duggal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 1 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:02 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Apr 1999
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2000 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 02 Aug 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jan 2019 |
|
Active |