skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/10/21 10:55:27 AM

Wertman, Antoinette

CPSO#: 30507

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 05 Aug 2021
EXPIRY DATE
05 Aug 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, Ontario M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 15 Sep 2009

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:01 Nov 1986 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2021