THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 3:42:19 AM
Wertman, Antoinette
CPSO#:
30507
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
05 Aug 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Dec 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto, Ontario
M6B 3Z4
Tel: (416) 781-9083
Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 15 Sep 2009
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1986 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 1986 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2021 |