skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 21:39:19 PM

Ingram, Karen Jennifer

CPSO#: 30073

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jun 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kawartha Centre - Redefining Health
168 Brock Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2P4
Phone: (705) 749-3906 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

GAIN Geriatric Team Port Hope CHC
99 Toronto Road
Port Hope ON  L1A 3S4
Canada
Phone: (905) 885-2626 Ext. 254
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

GAIN Geriatric Team
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: (705) 876 5021
Fax: (705) 876-5120
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. J. Ingram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ingram ( CPSO# 30073 )

Business Address:
1 - 168 Brock Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2P4
Phone Number: (705) 749-3906

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:12 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective:07 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAREN JENNIFER INGRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INGRAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1978