THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:23:28 AM
Ingram, Karen Jennifer
CPSO#:
30073
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jun 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kawartha Centre - Redefining Health
168 Brock Street
Peterborough ON K9H 2P4
Phone: (705) 749-3906
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:12 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:07 Dec 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAREN JENNIFER INGRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INGRAM is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1974 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Feb 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1978 |