skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 01/07/22 3:06:32 AM

Vasic, Vladimir

CPSO#: 29761

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 13 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 May 2003

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yugoslav

Education: University of Belgrade, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1978
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2002
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 May 2003
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2007
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2008
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 18 Sep 2008
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 13 Jan 2010

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 May 2009
Summary:

On May 11, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Vasic committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he: sexually abused a patient; engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional; and contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration.

Dr. Vasic made remarks of a sexual nature and engaged in sexual behaviour, including sexual intercourse, with a patient. Furthermore, Dr. Vasic practiced medicine while he knew that his certificate of registration was suspended, and failed to cooperate with the College in its investigation of this matter.

On January 13, 2010, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The Registrar revoke Dr. Vasic's certificate of registration, effective immediately.

2. Dr. Vasic appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3. Dr. Vasic reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, by February 28, 2010, in the amount of $10,000.

4. Dr. Vasic pay costs to the College in the amount of $14,600 by February 28, 2010.

5. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 11, 2009

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Jan 2007
Summary:

On January 3, 2007 the Discipline Committee found Dr. Vasic to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional; and that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has made a finding of incompetence or professional misconduct or a similar finding against the member, and the finding is based on facts which would, in the opinion of the College, be grounds for a finding of incompetence as defined in section 52 of the Code or would be an act of professional misconduct as defined in subsection (1).

On September 6, 2007, the Discipline Committee ordered the following:

1) that Dr. Vasic(s certificate of registration be suspended for 12 months, 3 months of which shall be suspended if he completes, at his own expense, the College(s Medical Ethics Course.
2) that Dr. Vasic pay costs of $5000 and
3) that the results of the proceedings be included in the register.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 20, 2006

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Aug 1999
Summary:

On August 23, 1999 a panel of the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found Dr. Vladimir Vasic guilty of professional misconduct as defined in paragraphs 29.22 and 29.33 on Ontario Regulation 548, R.R.O.

1990, made under the Health Disciplines Act, R.S.O. 1990. 1990, c. H.4, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, and in that the conduct set out in the agreed statement of facts is conduct or an act relevant to the practise of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Committee imposed the following penalty.

1. Dr. Vasic be reprimanded and the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the Register.

2. Dr. Vasic s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of six months.

The suspension shall commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar who shall take this action upon Dr. Vasic s return to practice in Ontario.

3. The Committee ordered that four months of the said suspension of Dr. Vasic s certificate of registration shall itself be suspended, provided that Dr. Vasic fulfills the following terms and conditions:

(a) Dr. Vasic attends an assessment program as arranged for him by the College;

(b) Prior to commencement of the program, Dr. Vasic provides written consent to the release by the College to the assessor(S) of any information considered appropriate by the Director of the Professional Enhancement Department of the College;

(c) Dr. Vasic co-operates in every respect with the assessment process;

(d) Dr. Vasic provides his written consent to the release by the assessor(s) to the College of the result of the assessment and of any information with respect to the assessment as may be considered necessary by the Director of Profesional Enhancement Department of the College or the assessor(s);

(e) Dr. Vasic completes successfully and to the satisfaction of the assessor(s) any program of upgrading which may be recommended by the assessor(s), and submits himself to such further re-assessment as may be recommended by the assessor(s), and completes any training or upgrading recommended by the assessor(s) from time to time on the occasion of any re-assessment(s) which may be recommended;

(f) Dr. Vasic shall within thirty days of the submission of an invoice therefore pay the costs of his assessment and re-assessment(s);

5. In the event that Dr. Vasic fails to comply with any of the terms and conditions as set out in paragraph four of this order, the balance of his suspension shall commence immediately.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 23, 1999