skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 0:55:21 AM

Buruiana, Manole

CPSO#: 27568

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 May 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 May 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Manole Buruiana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 11 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MANOLE BURUIANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURUIANA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Nov 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2021