THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:17:33 PM
Buruiana, Manole
CPSO#:
27568
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
30 Dec 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 May 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
30-Dec-2023
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian, Romanian
Education: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Manole Buruiana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 11 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Nov 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 2021 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 30 Dec 2023 |