skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 01/08/21 1:06:07 AM

McNamara, James Luke

CPSO#: 25837

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 22 Dec 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jul 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Monash University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1973
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 08 Oct 2003
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 22 Dec 2003

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Dec 2003
Summary:

 On December 22, 2003, the Discipline Committee found Dr. McNamara to have committed acts of 
 professional misconduct for sexual impropriety with a patient and conduct that would be regarded 
 as disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional.  The Committee also found Dr. McNamara to be 
 incompetent.  The Committee ordered the Registrar to revoke Dr. McNamara(s certificate of 
 registration immediately.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 22, 2003