THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:07:37 PM
McNamara, James Luke
CPSO#:
25837
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
22 Dec 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Jul 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
28-Feb-2022
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Monash University, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1973 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee |
Effective: 08 Oct 2003 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 22 Dec 2003 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Dec 2003
Summary:
On December 22, 2003, the Discipline Committee found Dr. McNamara to have committed acts of professional misconduct for sexual impropriety with a patient and conduct that would be regarded as disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional. The Committee also found Dr. McNamara to be incompetent. The Committee ordered the Registrar to revoke Dr. McNamara(s certificate of registration immediately.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 22, 2003