skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 01/12/21 19:53:48 PM

Hall, John Douglas

CPSO#: 24676

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Jun 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J.D. Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 5 2014

Medical Records Location

Instructions: To request a copy of records please fax Dr. Hall at 519-583-2287
Date Received: 25 Mar 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2014

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: July 1, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
As of July 1, 2014, Dr. John Douglas Hall has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.