THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 3:31:26 AM
Hall, John Douglas
CPSO#:
24676
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Jun 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J.D. Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 5 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:To request a copy of records please fax Dr. Hall at 519-583-2287
Date Received: 25 Mar 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2014 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: July 1, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
As of July 1, 2014, Dr. John Douglas Hall has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.