skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 03/07/22 7:13:32 AM

Dunlop, Peter Ewart

CPSO#: 19423

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Mar 1965

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Patients looking for a copy of their medical record should contact: 

The Medical Records Department
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
206 John Street
Dunnville, ON
N1A 2P7
Date Received: 26 Jun 2012


Instructions/Address:

Former patients of Dr. Dunlop who were under the care of Dr. Blake should contact Dr. Blake (#71529) to get a copy of their records.
All other patients should contact the following:  
Joan Grant
Office Manager
Medical Arts Building
334 Broad Street West
Dunnville, ON N1A 1T1

Tel: 905-774-7541
Date Received: 10 Oct 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1971 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012