skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 04/08/21 7:38:26 AM

Irwin, Michael Eugene

CPSO#: 19105

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Mar 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Feb 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Storage, (416) 781-9083 or 1-(888) 781-9083, Roseville Garden Walk-In Clinic, (519) 944-3393, Family Care Walk-In Medical Clinic, 2425 Tecumseh Road East, Windsor, ON, N8W 1E6
Date Received: 01 Jun 2016


Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Phone: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 20 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Mar 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 25 Mar 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 24, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective March 24, 2016, Dr. Irwin voluntarily resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.