THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 23:12:24 PM
Irwin, Michael Eugene
CPSO#:
19105
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Mar 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Feb 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Docudavit Storage, (416) 781-9083 or 1-(888) 781-9083, Roseville Garden Walk-In Clinic, (519) 944-3393, Family Care Walk-In Medical Clinic, 2425 Tecumseh Road East, Windsor, ON, N8W 1E6
Date Received: 01 Jun 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1963 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1964 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Feb 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 23 Feb 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Mar 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee |
Effective: 25 Mar 2016 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: March 24, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective March 24, 2016, Dr. Irwin voluntarily resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.