skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 05/07/20 10:51:04 AM

Himel, Calvin

CPSO#: 17060

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 19-Jul-2010

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1958 to 24 Jun 1959
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 May 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jul 2010