THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:11:29 PM
Himel, Calvin
CPSO#:
17060
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
19-Jul-2010
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1958
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Jan 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1958 to 24 Jun 1959
Other - Rotating Internship
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1959 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 May 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Jul 2010 |