THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 4:44:02 AM
Struthers, Emma Truus
CPSO#:
99986
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
10 South Front Street
Belleville ON K8N 2Y3
Phone: (613) 779-9910
Fax: (613) 779-9689
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial |
Trenton |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EMMA TRUUS STRUTHERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRUTHERS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Apr 2013 to 21 Apr 2013
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 22 Apr 2013 to 12 May 2013
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 13 May 2013 to 31 May 2013
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jun 2013 to 21 Jun 2013
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 20 Nov 2013 to 24 Nov 2013
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |