THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 19:23:34 PM
Montpellier, Renee-Anne Pierrette
CPSO#:
99983
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Apr 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Apr 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
North Shore Health Network |
Blind River |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Apr 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:25 Oct 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RENEE-ANNE PIERRETTE MONTPELLIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTPELLIER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2013 to 14 Apr 2013
EL - Dermatology
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Apr 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2015 |