THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:58:48 AM
Ahmed, Mohammed Sayeed
CPSO#:
99979
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Sep 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
30 Sep 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, Hindi, Telugu, Urdu
Education: Dr. N.T.R University of Health Sciences, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2200 EGLINTON AVENUE WEST
Mississauga ON L5M2N1
Phone: 9058132200
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:11 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Mar 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Mar 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 18 Mar 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Mar 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2016 |
|
Active |