THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 15:58:50 PM
Perron, Thomas Michael
CPSO#:
99973
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
25 Mar 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Feb 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 25 Mar 2013 to 07 Apr 2013
EL - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 09 Feb 2016 to 22 Feb 2016
EL - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Feb 2016 to 25 Mar 2016
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Mar 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Apr 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Mar 2016 |