THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 3:11:50 AM
Roy Goswami, Ipsita
CPSO#:
99968
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calcutta, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Jul 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Mar 2013 to 13 May 2013
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
McMaster University, 14 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 May 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2026 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Mar 2023 |
|
Active |