THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 17:19:47 PM
Lam, Simon
CPSO#:
99961
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
23 Feb 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jan 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2013 to 05 Apr 2013
EL - Paediatric Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 30 Jan 2017 to 23 Feb 2017
EL - Paediatric Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Apr 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jan 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Feb 2017 |