THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 8:27:19 AM
Das, Amlan Kusum
CPSO#:
99955
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi
Education: University of Calcutta, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:03 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMLAN KUSUM DAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Mar 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 27 Feb 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Nov 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 2017 |