THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:31:25 AM
Smerdon, Kirsten
CPSO#:
99940
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 May 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 May 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 2868
Fax: (905) 721-6103
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Northumberland Hills Hospital |
Cobourg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIRSTEN SMERDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMERDON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 23 Feb 2013 to 08 Mar 2013
EL - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 28 Sep 2015 to 25 Oct 2015
EL - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Mar 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Oct 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 May 2016 |