THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 2:33:08 AM
Mehdar, Albayda Mustafa H
CPSO#:
99936
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
04 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Nov 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 May 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Mar 2013 to 04 May 2013
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 05 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 13 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 14 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 13 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 14 Dec 2016 to 05 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 05 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 Feb 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 29 Jul 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 2018 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Sep 2020 |