THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:06:36 PM
Owens, Deyzi Edieva
CPSO#:
99935
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Mar 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
03 Mar 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bulgarian, English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-16 Amy Croft Dr
Windsor ON N9K 0A1
Phone: 5199795171
Fax: 519 979 5141
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Aug 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2013 to 31 Mar 2013
EL - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
EL - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Dec 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Mar 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Mar 2015 |
|
Active |