THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:22:26 PM
Menon, Suresh
CPSO#:
99923
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Apr 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Apr 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Calicut University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
Division of Neurology
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44235
Fax: 905-577-8265
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:01 Apr 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Neurology |
Effective:01 Jul 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2013 to 09 Apr 2013
PEAP - CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 10 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Aug 2014 to 18 Dec 2014
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Dec 2014 to 31 Mar 2015
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
|
Active |