THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 4:38:54 AM
Al-Abri, Mahmood Shaikhan Abdullah
CPSO#:
99916
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Aug 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Manchester Medical School, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 3E7
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site |
St Catharines |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:09 Nov 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAHMOOD SHAIKHAN ABDULLAH AL-ABRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-ABRI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Mar 2013 to 02 May 2013
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 03 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 25 Sep 2017 to 19 Nov 2017
EL - Hematology
University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2018 to 11 Feb 2018
EL - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Nov 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Feb 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2019 |