THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:46:55 AM
Willows, Karla Astrid
CPSO#:
99900
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 21 Feb 2013 to 20 Mar 2013
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 21 Mar 2013 to 17 Apr 2013
EL - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Feb 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Apr 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |