THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:33:46 PM
Rohani, Atoosheh
CPSO#:
99898
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Nov 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Nov 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: BABOL UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Curans Heart Centre
1165 Barton St
Thunder Bay ON P7B 5N3
Phone: (807) 345-3355
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:14 Nov 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Mar 2013 to 17 May 2013
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 18 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Nov 2013
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 May 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Nov 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Aug 2023 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Sep 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Sep 2023 |
|
Active |