THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 8:37:53 AM
Glynn, Aaron Anthony John
CPSO#:
99897
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Mar 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University College of Dublin, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 19 Feb 2013 to 20 Mar 2013
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 21 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Mar 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2013 |