THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:54:39 PM
Bushehri, Ahmad A R A M
CPSO#:
99891
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
05 Apr 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education
as of
28 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2013 to 05 May 2013
PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 06 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 05 Apr 2021
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 May 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Apr 2021 |