THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:55:39 AM
Merali, Ali-Reza Muhammad
CPSO#:
99867
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Gujarati, Kachchi
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Bldg A, Suite 201
9100 Jane Street
Mackenzie Heart Centre
Vaughan ON L4K 0A4
Phone: 905-832-9311
Fax: 1-888-402-2389
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Norfolk General Hospital |
Simcoe |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:18 Oct 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALI-REZA MUHAMMAD MERALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERALI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 11 Feb 2013 to 10 Mar 2013
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2013 to 07 Apr 2013
EL - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Apr 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |