THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:50:48 AM
Desouky, Hesham Mohamed Shafik Ali
CPSO#:
99844
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Feb 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Feb 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Mansoura University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Center for Addiction and Mental Hea
Schizophrenia Division
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON M6J 1H1
Phone: 416 535 8501
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:10 Aug 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HESHAM MOHAMED SHAFIK ALI DESOUKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESOUKY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jan 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 28 Jan 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Feb 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2019 |