THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 16:20:52 PM
Sivapalasingam, Nihilarani
CPSO#:
99822
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
12 Nov 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Jaffna, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jan 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 03 Jan 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Apr 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2015 |