THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:55:44 PM
Neder Serafini, Jose Alberto
CPSO#:
99818
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Oct 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice
as of
06 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Uni Federal De Mato Grosso Do Sul, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:02 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:02 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSE ALBERTO NEDER SERAFINI may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY in which Dr. NEDER SERAFINI holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. NEDER SERAFINI may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. NEDER SERAFINI no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. NEDER SERAFINI no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. NEDER SERAFINI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jan 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 26 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 24 Jun 2015 |