THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 8:13:44 AM
Ng, Kuan Huei
CPSO#:
99804
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Jul 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Malay, Mandarin
Education: University of London, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
DBCVSRI
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:20 Jul 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Neurology |
Effective:20 Jul 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 15 Jan 2013 to 15 Mar 2013
PEAP - CF - Neurology
McMaster University, 16 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Mar 2014
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Mar 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Aug 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Dec 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jul 2020 |
|
Active |