THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:10:18 AM
So, Petsy Pui-Sze
CPSO#:
99796
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
28 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Ottawa, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:18 Oct 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 21 Jan 2013 to 08 Feb 2013
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 03 Jun 2013 to 28 Jun 2013
EL - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Feb 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jun 2013 |