THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 15:24:00 PM
Ee, Mong Tieng
CPSO#:
99777
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Apr 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin, Taiwanese
Education: University of Malaya, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4001 Leslie Street
North York General Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
Toronto ON M2K 1E1
Phone: 4167566000
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Malaysia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:31 Mar 2022 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine |
Effective:31 Mar 2022 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MONG TIENG EE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 25 Mar 2013
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 21 Sep 2017
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 23 Sep 2018
AVP - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Mar 2022
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Apr 2022 |