THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:01:14 AM
Cooney, Megan Joan
CPSO#:
99739
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Dec 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jan 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Adolescent Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2013 to 06 Feb 2013
EL - Adolescent Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Feb 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2016 |