THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:47:40 AM
Kanagalingam, Ambi
CPSO#:
99736
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
18 May 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 May 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Toronto, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
EL - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2013 to 22 Dec 2013
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 23 Dec 2013 to 12 Jan 2014
EL - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 05 May 2014 to 18 May 2014
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Dec 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jan 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Jan 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 May 2014 |