THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 15:28:20 PM
Berlin Rosenblut, Alejandro Miguel
CPSO#:
99728
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Sep 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Spanish
Education: Catholic University of Chile, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Avenue, 5th Floor
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 2126
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Chile
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:27 Aug 2021 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 15 Feb 2013
PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 16 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Aug 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Aug 2021 |
|
Active |