THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:58:24 PM
Parekh, Shrenik Pratapbhai
CPSO#:
99705
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Dec 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
19 Dec 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi
Education: Gujarat University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Shrenik Parekh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 15 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:19 Dec 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Dec 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 08 Feb 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 May 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Aug 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 08 Aug 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Aug 2014 |
|
Active |