THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 23:05:12 PM
Jahangirvand, Alex
CPSO#:
99691
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Feb 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Feb 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
480 Huronia Road, Suite 204
Barrie ON L4N 6M2
Phone: 705-503-5800
Fax: 705-503-5801
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEX JAHANGIRVAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAHANGIRVAND is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 31 Jan 2013
EL - Paediatric Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Aug 2013 to 18 Oct 2013
EL - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Feb 2016 |